Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Henry Krawczak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Subbar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1913Born
18 May 194027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Feb 197360.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Feb 197360.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Subbar
3 Apr 197360.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subbar
17 Aug 198269.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
13 Jan 200086.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Arthur Henry Krawczak
Bishop Arthur Henry Krawczak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018