Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Ronald Cooney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gaylord, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1934BornDetroit
20 Dec 195925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
3 Dec 198248.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
3 Dec 198248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hodelm
27 Jan 198348.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hodelm
6 Nov 198955.6AppointedBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
28 Jan 199055.8InstalledBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
7 Oct 200975.5RetiredBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
15 Oct 201278.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gaylord, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Ronald Cooney:
Bishop Patrick Ronald Cooney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gaylord

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2009
  • d: CB, 15 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015