Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Anthony Hebda

Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1959 BornPittsburgh, PA
6 Apr 198929.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Jul 198929.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Oct 200950.0AppointedBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
1 Dec 200950.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
24 Sep 201354.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
5 Nov 201354.1InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
15 Jun 201555.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
24 Mar 201656.5AppointedArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
13 May 201656.6InstalledArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Anthony Hebda
Archbishop Bernard Anthony Hebda (born ) Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,322
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2013
  • i: CB, 24 Sep 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2016
  • i: CB, 29 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 30 Apr 2016