Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Donald William Cardinal Wuerl

Archbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1940 Born
17 Dec 196626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Nov 198545.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
30 Nov 198545.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
6 Jan 198645.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
26 May 198746.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
11 Feb 198847.2AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Feb 198847.2InstalledBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
16 May 200665.5AppointedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
22 Jun 200665.6InstalledArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
20 Nov 201070.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201070.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
8 May 201170.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
12 Oct 201877.9RetiredArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
12 Oct 201877.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald William Wuerl (VIAF: 11088272)
Donald William Cardinal Wuerl (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Washington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 May 2006
  • i: Bollettino, 3 May 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Oct 2018

Quantcast