Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Feudjio

Bishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1955 Born
29 Sep 199034.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
2 Mar 202165.4AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
17 Apr 202165.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome Feudjio
Bishop Jerome Feudjio (born ) Bishop of Saint Thomas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFonakeukeu, Diocese of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, St. Thomas, Diocese of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Thomas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2021
  • c1: CB, 2 Mar 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Mar 2021
  • c34: CB, 27 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast