Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Washington

Archidioecesis Vashingtonensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Donald William Wuerl, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Francisco González Valer, S.F., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Martin David Holley, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Barry Christopher Knestout, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Theodore Edgar McCarrick, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Leonard James Olivier, S.V.D., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 15 November 1947
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: District of Columbia
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 5,447 (2,104 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: IV (DC, DE, MD, VA, VI, WV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: WDC
  • Official Web Site: http://www.adw.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archdiocesan Pastoral Center, 5001 Eastern Ave., Hyattsville, MD 20782; P.O. Box 29260, Washington, DC 20017
  • Telephone: (301)853-4520
  • Fax: 853-5346

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
15 November 1947SplitArchdiocese of Baltimore-Washington Archdiocese of Baltimore
Archdiocese of Washington (District of Columbia plus Montgomery, Prince George, St. Mary's, Calvert, and Charles Counties in the State of Maryland)
12 October 1965ElevatedArchdiocese of Washington (becomes a Metropolitan)
28 May 1974Territory LostDiocese of Richmond
Archdiocese of Washington
Diocese of Arlington (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950175,0001,219,80614.3%1445466902531,2181,20583ap1951
1966361,4821,749,00620.7%3388411,1793061,1951,865122ap1967
1970396,2122,327,12717.0%3177781,0953611,2011,541123ap1971
1976396,4212,090,80019.0%3627951,157342561,3991,200127ap1977
1980402,0002,126,00018.9%300661961418921,295974132ap1981
1990400,0002,200,30018.2%3576641,0213911629251,021136ap1991
1999510,0002,413,70021.1%333541874583232152827139ap2000
2000515,0002,419,32421.3%4556371,092471229966771140ap2001
2001551,4362,436,40722.6%4596501,109497234948748140ap2002
2002581,4942,528,23523.0%4486821,130514233997751140ap2003
2003581,9002,571,39522.6%4546061,060548191874734140ap2004
2004567,2662,614,12821.7%4206611,081524187930734140ap2005
2010592,7692,694,40522.0%407375782758179636583140ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 28 Feb 2014