Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Francis Donoghue

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Atlanta, Georgia, USA


from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Motto: To Live In Christ Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1928Born
4 Jun 195526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
6 Nov 198456.2AppointedBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
18 Dec 198456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
22 Jun 199364.8AppointedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
19 Aug 199365.0InstalledArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
9 Dec 200476.3RetiredArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
11 Nov 201183.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary
John Francis Donoghue
Archbishop John Francis Donoghue
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Atlanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, DC, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestSt. Matthew, Cathedral, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopAuditorium, Civic Center, Charlotte, Diocese of Charlotte, North Carolina

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Nov 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,527
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: CB, 11 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025