Catholic-Hierarchy DC

James Aloysius Cardinal Hickey

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre del Redentore a Tor Bella Monaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1920BornMidland, MI
15 Jun 194625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
18 Feb 196746.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
18 Feb 196746.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Taraqua
14 Apr 196746.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taraqua
1 Mar 196948.4AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
5 Jun 197453.7AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
16 Jul 197453.8InstalledBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
17 Jun 198059.7AppointedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
5 Aug 198059.8InstalledArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Jun 198867.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198867.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre del Redentore a Tor Bella Monaca
21 Nov 200080.1RetiredArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
24 Oct 200484.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for James Aloysius Hickey:
James Aloysius Cardinal Hickey (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Washington

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
  • a cardinal for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014