Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Bernard Scharfenberger

Bishop of Albany, New York, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Buffalo, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1948 Born
2 Jul 197325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
11 Feb 201465.7AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
10 Apr 201465.8Ordained BishopBishop of Albany, New York, USA
4 Dec 201971.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Bernard Scharfenberger
Bishop Edward Bernard Scharfenberger (born ) Bishop of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopImmacualte Conception, Cathedral, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albany.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014
  • c1/ob: CB, 11 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 12 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,142
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 4 Dec 2019

Quantcast