Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Albany

Dioecesis Albanensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 April 1847
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of New York
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: New York
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 26,975 (10,419 Square Miles)
  • Description: Albany, Columbia, Delaware, Fulton, Green, Montgomery, Otsego, Rensselaer, Saratoga, Schenectady, Schoharie, Warren, and Washington Counties plus parts of Herkimer and Hamilton Counties.
  • Conference Region: II (NY)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: ALB
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcda.org/
  • Mailing Address: 40 N. Main Ave., Albany, NY 12203-1422
  • Telephone: (518) 453-6600
  • Fax: 453-6795

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 April 1847ErectedDiocese of New York Diocese of Albany (erected)
15 February 1872Territory LostDiocese of Albany Diocese of Ogdensburg (erected)
26 November 1886Territory LostDiocese of Albany Diocese of Syracuse (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950285,775952,02230.0%379198577495315710159ap1951
1959357,6001,031,74734.7%3962346305673681,680206ap1960
1965397,6121,160,42034.3%4732557285463901,872208ap1967
1968426,9681,322,00032.3%4722717435743861,468207ap1971
1976424,2191,472,68428.8%4172126296743971,245207ap1977
1980412,0001,492,00027.6%369158527781362481,422201ap1981
1990427,0221,123,09038.0%327168495862812371,168199ap1991
1999403,4031,340,38830.1%30611842495193861,001186ap2000
2000411,0001,365,00030.1%2921184101,00287214951184ap2001
2001411,0001,386,20029.6%2641053691,11389199934183ap2002
2002400,0001,340,45029.8%2571053621,10491199910182ap2003
2003400,0001,342,46029.8%2461083541,12995194895181ap2004
2004400,0001,342,46529.8%2271083351,19497188867178ap2005
2006403,0001,351,00029.8%2321083401,185105188832167ap2007
2012337,2001,374,00024.5%189592481,359105128646128ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 13 Feb 2014