Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Philip Prindle Wadhams

Deceased

Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1817Born
6 Jun 184629.0Converted
15 Jan 185032.6Ordained PriestPriest of Albany, New York, USA
15 Feb 187254.7AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
5 May 187254.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
5 Dec 189174.5DiedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edgar Philip Prindle Wadhams (VIAF: 252010053)
Bishop Edgar Philip Prindle Wadhams (born , died ) Bishop of Ogdensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLewis, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017