Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Narcisse Zéphirin Lorrain

Deceased

Bishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1842Born
4 Aug 186725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
14 Jul 188240.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pontiac, Ontario, Canada
14 Jul 188240.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chytri
21 Sep 188240.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chytri
6 May 189855.8AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
18 Dec 191573.5DiedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Narcisse Zéphirin Lorrain (VIAF: 58611571)
Bishop Narcisse Zéphirin Lorrain (born , died ) Bishop of Pembroke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Martin, Diocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Montréal, Diocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 204, and Page 445
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017