Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Albert Blais

Deceased

Bishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1842Born
6 Jun 186825.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 188947.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada
28 Dec 188947.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
18 May 189047.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
6 Feb 189148.4SucceededBishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada
8 Mar 189148.5InstalledBishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada
23 Jan 191976.4DiedBishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for André-Albert Blais (VIAF: 51221495)
Bishop André-Albert Blais (born , died ) Bishop of Rimouski (St. Germain of)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Valier
Ordained BishopQuébec, Archdiocese of Québec

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 284, and Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017