Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Thomas Duhamel

Deceased

Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1841Born
19 Dec 186322.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 187432.8AppointedBishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
28 Oct 187432.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
8 Jun 188644.5AppointedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
5 Jun 190967.5DiedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Thomas Duhamel (VIAF: 48760131)
Archbishop Joseph-Thomas Duhamel (born , died ) Archbishop of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceContrecoeur, Diocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ottawa, Diocese of Ottawa, Ontario

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017