Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Trois-Rivières

Dioecesis Trifluvianensis in Canada



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Luc André Bouchard, Bishop
  • Pierre Olivier Tremblay, O.M.I., Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
  • Laurent Noël, Bishop Emeritus
  • Martin Veillette, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 8 June 1852
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Québec
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 34,956 (13,501 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Quebec
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: TR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-tr.qc.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, C.P. 879, 362 rue Bonaventure, Trois-Rivières, QC G9A 5J2, Canada
  • Telephone: (819)379-1432
  • Fax: 375-6382

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
8 June 1852ErectedArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Trois-Rivières (erected)
28 August 1874Territory LostArchdiocese of Québec
Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe
Diocese of Trois-Rivières
Diocese of Sherbrooke (erected)
11 July 1882Territory LostDiocese of Ottawa
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
Diocese of Trois-Rivières
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontiac (erected)
10 July 1885Territory LostDiocese of Trois-Rivières Diocese of Nicolet (erected)
31 May 2007Territory AddedDiocese of Amos Diocese of Chicoutimi (Opitciwan (Obedjiwan))
Diocese of Joliette (Manawan)
Diocese of Trois-Rivières (Parent)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950181,973184,82998.5%238893275564951,52583ap1951
1966241,380244,69398.6%3001064065944491,72792ap1967
1970236,909240,95398.3%3061184245584481,62397ap1971
1976227,755230,29198.9%2561113676203661,39397ap1977
1980242,000245,00098.8%2349933372623341,23297ap1981
1990256,930261,49198.3%1811052868981528897494ap1991
1999249,919253,85598.4%159842431,0282617572391ap2000
2000251,210255,64798.3%134842181,1522816569691ap2001
2001251,210255,64798.3%129852141,1732917769685ap2002
2002250,327256,20897.7%127812081,2033117362884ap2003
2003247,971251,65898.5%121822031,2213115559384ap2004
2004247,999250,71598.9%116771931,2843315257866ap2005
2010245,108248,27498.7%98751731,4163013640463ap2011
2014255,000265,30096.1%85611461,7463212333162ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast