Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Luis Martin Buisson, P.M.E.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pucallpa

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1934 BornTrios-Rivières
1 Jul 195723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
18 Apr 198652.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru
18 Apr 198652.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Numidia
17 Aug 198652.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Numidia
23 Oct 198955.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru
8 Sep 200874.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Luis Martin Buisson:
Bishop Juan Luis Martin Buisson P.M.E. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pucallpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Pucallpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013