Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Landázuri Ricketts, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1913BornArequipa
16 Apr 193925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 May 195238.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lima, Peru
18 May 195238.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhoina
24 Aug 195238.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhoina
2 May 195541.4AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
19 Mar 196248.3Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 196248.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
30 Dec 198976.0RetiredArchbishop of Lima, Peru
16 Jan 199783.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Landázuri Ricketts:
Juan Cardinal Landázuri Ricketts O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
  • a cardinal for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014