Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Gustavo Castillo Mattasoglio

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1950 Born
16 Oct 198333.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
15 Jul 198434.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
25 Jan 201968.9AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
2 Mar 201969.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Carlos Gustavo Castillo Mattasoglio (VIAF: 65153651683655780368)
Archbishop Carlos Gustavo Castillo Mattasoglio (born ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained DeaconCaprona, Archdiocese of Pisa, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2019
  • mn/c1/ob: CB, 25 Jan 2019
  • c2: CB, 2 Feb 2019
  • c3+: CB, 6 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 7 Jul 2019

Quantcast