Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Girasoli

Apostolic Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda

Titular Archbishop of Egnazia Appula

Apostolic Delegate to Antilles

Apostolic Nuncio to Barbados

Apostolic Nuncio to Bahamas

Apostolic Nuncio to Dominica

Apostolic Nuncio to Grenada

Apostolic Nuncio to Guyana

Apostolic Nuncio to Jamaica

Apostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis

Apostolic Nuncio to Saint Lucia

Apostolic Nuncio to Suriname

Apostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago

Apostolic Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1957 BornRuvo di Puglia, Italy
15 Jun 198022.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 198629.2IncardinatedPriest of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
24 Jan 200648.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Egnazia Appula
24 Jan 200648.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zambia
24 Jan 200648.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malawi
11 Mar 200648.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Egnazia Appula
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahamas, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominica, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jamaica, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Grenada, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Lucia, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Suriname, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guyana, Antilles
29 Oct 201154.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Antilles
21 Dec 201154.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
21 Dec 201154.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Barbados, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Girasoli:
Archbishop Nicolas Girasoli (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Antigua and Barbuda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Antigua and Barbuda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,087
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 6 Dec 2013