Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Pagani, S.M.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Mangochi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1937 BornTorre Boldone di Bergamo
8 Sep 195922.6ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
13 Mar 196528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
3 Apr 200770.2AppointedBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
26 May 200770.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
6 Dec 201376.9RetiredBishop of Mangochi, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Pagani:
Bishop Alessandro Pagani S.M.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mangochi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mangochi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,424
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015