Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Samorè

Deceased

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1905BornBardi
10 Jun 192822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
30 Jan 195044.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ternobus
30 Jan 195044.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
16 Apr 195044.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ternobus
17 Feb 195347.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
26 Jun 196761.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
26 Jun 196761.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 Sep 196761.8AppointedPresident of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
1 Nov 196862.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
25 Jan 197468.1AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
25 Jan 197468.1AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
12 Dec 197469.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
3 Feb 198377.2DiedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Antonio Samorè:
Cardinal Antonio Samorè (born , died ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013