Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Décoste

Deceased

Bishop of Hinche, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1925Born
8 Mar 195227.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 196641.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
20 Aug 196641.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
28 Oct 196641.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
20 Apr 197247.2AppointedBishop of Hinche, Haïti
20 May 198055.2DiedBishop of Hinche, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Décoste
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Décoste (born , died ) Bishop of Hinche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis du Sud, Diocese of Les Cayes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Oct 2020

Quantcast