Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert François Cousineau, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cap-Haïtien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1895BornSaint-Laurent, Canada
25 May 191823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
10 Jan 195156.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
10 Jan 195156.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vartana
16 Mar 195156.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vartana
29 Jun 195358.4SucceededBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
2 Apr 196873.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
14 Aug 197479.6DiedBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Albert François Cousineau:
Archbishop Albert François Cousineau C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Cap-Haïtien

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • parc: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015