Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Constant

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1928BornPort-au-Prince
12 Jul 195325.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 196638.6AppointedBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
28 Oct 196638.8Ordained BishopBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
30 Jul 200375.6RetiredBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
16 Jun 200981.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Constant:
Bishop Emmanuel Constant (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Les Gonaïves

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013