Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves-Marie Péan, C.S.C.

Bishop of Les Gonaïves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1954 BornPilate
16 Oct 198329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 May 200248.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
13 Oct 200248.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti
30 Jul 200349.2SucceededBishop of Les Gonaïves, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Yves-Marie Péan:
Bishop Yves-Marie Péan C.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Les Gonaïves

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Les Gonaïves.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014