Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cap-Haïtien

Archidioecesis Capitis Haitiani



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Max Leroy Mésidor, Archbishop
  • Louis Kébreau, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 7 April 1988
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Haïti
  • Square Kilometers: 2,200 (849 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 22, rue 19-20 H, Cap-Haïtien, Haïti, W.I.
  • Telephone: 2262-0071; 2262-1365
  • Fax: 2262-1278

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cap-Haïtien
3 October 1861ErectedArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Cap-Haïtien (erected)
20 April 1972Territory LostDiocese of Cap-Haïtien
Diocese of Les Gonaïves
Diocese of Hinche (erected)
Archdiocese of Cap-Haïtien
7 April 1988ElevatedDiocese of Cap-Haïtien Archdiocese of Cap-Haïtien
31 January 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Cap-Haïtien
Diocese of Hinche
Diocese of Fort-Liberté (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cap-Haïtien
1949485,000500,00097.0%4511568,660134027ap1951
1959490,000505,00097.0%4733806,125328542ap1960
1966630,000881,73071.5%3750877,2417417444ap1967
1968675,000881,73076.6%4554996,8187919547ap1971
1976601,826856,89570.2%2462866,99710117043ap1977
19801,039,9951,195,34787.0%24568012,99911016943ap1981
Archdiocese of Cap-Haïtien
19901,000,0001,530,13065.4%38428012,5006416945ap1991
1999730,7701,231,47659.3%44236710,907349837ap2000
2000757,3571,262,26260.0%44216511,651339637ap2001
2001750,8751,293,81858.0%48216910,882349639ap2002
2002757,6481,326,16357.1%54217510,101349839ap2003
2003780,0001,359,31757.4%46236911,304379541ap2004
2004800,0001,393,00057.4%46247011,428389841ap2005
2006778,1101,463,52053.2%49237210,807399643ap2007
2007827,0001,600,00051.7%5528839,963459844ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014