Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Constant-Mathurin Hillion

Deceased

Archbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1830Born
24 Mar 185524.4Ordained PriestPriest
Sep 187241.8SelectedBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
22 Dec 187343.1ConfirmedBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
8 Feb 187443.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
24 May 187443.5InstalledBishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
10 Jun 188655.6AppointedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
21 Feb 189059.3DiedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Constant-Mathurin Hillion
Archbishop Constant-Mathurin Hillion (born , died ) Archbishop of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMauron, France
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne-d'Auray, Sainte-Anne-d'Auray

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 179, and Page 467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017