Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Fournier

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1803Born
9 Jun 182724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
21 May 187067.0SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
27 Jun 187067.1ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
10 Aug 187067.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
9 Jun 187774.1DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Félix Fournier (VIAF: 37093633)
Bishop Félix Fournier (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017