Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand-René Maupoint

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1810Born
14 Mar 183524.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 185746.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
19 Mar 185746.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
11 Jun 185746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
10 Jul 187160.5DiedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Armand-René Maupoint (VIAF: 160482325)
Bishop Armand-René Maupoint (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChênehutte-les-Tuffeaux, Diocese of Angers, France, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Philippe du Roule, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017