Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital-Honoré Tirmarche

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Adrasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1796Born
10 Jun 185357.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
7 Aug 185357.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
17 Jul 187175.2DiedTitular Bishop of Adrasus

MicroData Summary for Vital-Honoré Tirmarche
Bishop Vital-Honoré Tirmarche (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Adrasus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbeville, France
Ordained BishopTuileries Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017