Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Martin Porchez

Deceased

Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1805Born
12 Jul 182923.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 185852.6SelectedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
27 Sep 185852.8ConfirmedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
21 Nov 185853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
11 Jun 186054.5DiedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Louis-Martin Porchez
Bishop Louis-Martin Porchez (born , died ) Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmiens, Diocese of Amiens, France, France
Ordained Bishop30 rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017