Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Antoine-Claude-Marie Boudinet

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1806Born
18 Jul 183023.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 185649.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pamiers, France
11 Mar 185649.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
3 May 185649.6SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
16 Jun 185649.7ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
20 Jul 185649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
29 Jul 185649.9InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
1 Apr 187366.5DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Antoine-Claude-Marie Boudinet (VIAF: 44616466)
Bishop Jacques-Antoine-Claude-Marie Boudinet (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Rogatien
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 94, and Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017