Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred Duquesnay

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1814BornRouen
25 May 183924.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 187157.1SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
22 Dec 187157.2ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
10 Feb 187257.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
17 Feb 188166.4SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
13 May 188166.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
15 Sep 188470.0DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Alfred Duquesnay:
Archbishop Alfred Duquesnay (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 176, and Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013