Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Charles-Dominique Denéchau

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1832Born
20 Dec 185624.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 187845.8SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
28 Feb 187946.1ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
1 Apr 187946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
18 Apr 190875.3DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Charles-Dominique Denéchau (VIAF: 95320929)
Bishop Henri-Charles-Dominique Denéchau (born , died ) Bishop of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrémentines
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trous, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 573
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017