Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marie Arlet

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1858BornMartel
29 Jun 188123.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 190749.3AppointedBishop of Angoulême, France
1 Sep 190749.4Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
10 Sep 190749.4InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
15 May 193375.1DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie Arlet:
Bishop Henri-Marie Arlet (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • op/i: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015