Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles du Pont de Ligonnès

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1845BornMende
19 Aug 187731.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190660.4AppointedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
25 Feb 190660.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
20 Mar 190660.5InstalledBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
5 Feb 192579.3DiedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Charles du Pont de Ligonnès:
Bishop Charles du Pont de Ligonnès (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013