Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Verdier

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

Titular Bishop of Titopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1854Born
22 Mar 191762.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
22 Mar 191762.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Titopolis
20 Jun 191762.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titopolis
21 May 192469.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Verdier
Bishop Pierre Verdier (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrommes, Commune de Mur-de-Barrez

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017