Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Castanier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osaka, Japan

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1877Born
23 Sep 189922.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Jul 191841.4AppointedBishop of Osaka, Japan
29 Aug 191841.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osaka, Japan
29 Nov 194063.8ResignedBishop of Osaka, Japan
29 Nov 194063.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
12 Mar 194366.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Osaka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Castanier
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Castanier M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLacapelle-de-Fraisse, France

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast