Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernand-Jean-Joseph Thiry, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fukuoka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1884BornAnor, France
29 Jun 190722.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
14 Jul 192742.8AppointedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
11 Dec 192743.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
10 May 193045.6DiedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Fernand-Jean-Joseph Thiry:
Bishop Fernand-Jean-Joseph Thiry M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Fukuoka

  • a priest for 22.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013