Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Osaka

Archidioecesis Osakensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thomas Aquino Manyo Maeda, Archbishop
  • Michael Gorō Matsuura, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Leo Jun Ikenaga, S.J., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Paul Hisao Yasuda, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 June 1969
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 15,000 (5,793 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.osaka.catholic.jp/
  • Mailing Address: Tamatsukuri 2-24-22, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi 540-0004, Japan
  • Telephone: (06)6941-9700
  • Fax: 6946-1345

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Japan
20 March 1888ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan Vicariate Apostolic of Central Japan (erected)
Diocese of Osaka
15 June 1891ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Central Japan Diocese of Osaka
27 January 1904Territory LostDiocese of Osaka Prefecture Apostolic of Shikoku (erected)
4 May 1923Territory LostDiocese of Osaka Vicariate Apostolic of Hiroshima (erected)
17 June 1937Territory LostDiocese of Osaka Prefecture Apostolic of Kyoto (erected)
Archdiocese of Osaka
24 June 1969ElevatedDiocese of Osaka Archdiocese of Osaka

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Osaka
195010,1107,952,905.1%4755102994245135ap1951
Archdiocese of Osaka
197050,85312,917,024.4%5517422922220989973ap1971
198056,94414,340,980.4%48168216263121085179ap1981
199054,51915,245,569.4%5415721125820077981ap1991
199955,87115,313,000.4%5114219328917271178ap2000
200055,92015,340,936.4%5113518630016171478ap2001
200156,10315,453,402.4%51130181309116370078ap2002
200256,11415,454,494.4%53126179313115471078ap2003
200355,73615,466,757.4%54125179311115268778ap2004
200455,73215,502,027.4%55118173322114368577ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Aug 2014