Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Gorō Matsuura

Bishop of Nagoya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1952 BornNagoya
21 Mar 198128.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 199946.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osaka, Japan
19 Apr 199946.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
17 Jul 199946.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
29 Mar 201562.5AppointedBishop of Nagoya, Japan

MicroData Summary for Michael Gorō Matsuura:
Bishop Michael Gorō Matsuura (born ) Bishop of Nagoya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nagoya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,588
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015