Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Yoshinao Otsuka

Bishop of Kyōto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1954 BornKyoto
20 Mar 198429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kyōto, Japan
3 Mar 199742.4AppointedBishop of Kyōto, Japan
15 Jun 199742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kyōto, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Yoshinao Otsuka:
Bishop Paul Yoshinao Otsuka (born ) Bishop of Kyōto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kyōto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015