Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Mitsuru Shirahama, P.S.S.

Bishop of Hiroshima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1962 BornKamigoto
19 Mar 199027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nagasaki, Japan
1993²30.6ProfessedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
28 Jun 201654.1AppointedBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
19 Sep 201654.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hiroshima, Japan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexis Mitsuru Shirahama
Bishop Alexis Mitsuru Shirahama P.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Hiroshima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hiroshima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jul 2016
  • c34: CB, 19 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016