Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Hisao Yasuda

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Osaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1921BornKurume
21 May 195533.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 197048.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osaka, Japan
5 Feb 197048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tucci
21 Mar 197048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tucci
15 Nov 197856.9AppointedArchbishop of Osaka, Japan
10 May 199775.3RetiredArchbishop of Osaka, Japan
23 Apr 201694.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Osaka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Hisao Yasuda
Archbishop Paul Hisao Yasuda (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Osaka

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 25 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016