Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinus Jun-ichi Nomura

Bishop Emeritus of Nagoya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1937 BornKochi
19 Dec 196427.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 199355.3AppointedBishop of Nagoya, Japan
4 Jul 199355.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nagoya, Japan
29 Mar 201577.3RetiredBishop of Nagoya, Japan

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Jun-ichi Nomura:
Bishop Augustinus Jun-ichi Nomura (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nagoya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nagoya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,163
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015