Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Yoshiyuki Furuya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kyōto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1900BornWakayama
1 Jul 192828.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 194545.8AppointedPrefect of Kyoto, Japan
12 Jul 195151.4AppointedBishop of Kyōto, Japan
21 Sep 195151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kyōto, Japan
8 Jul 197676.4ResignedBishop of Kyōto, Japan
2 Feb 199191.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kyōto, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Yoshiyuki Furuya:
Bishop Paul Yoshiyuki Furuya (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kyōto

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 346
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013