Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tōkyō

Archidioecesis Tokiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Takeo Okada, Archbishop
  • James Kazuo Koda, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Paul Kazuhiro Mori, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 15 June 1891
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 7,343 (2,836 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.tokyo.catholic.jp/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Sekiguchi 3-16-15, Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 112-0014, Japan
  • Telephone: (03)3943-2301
  • Fax: 3944-8511

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Japan
1 May 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Japan (erected)
22 May 1876Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Japan Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Japan
22 May 1876Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Japan Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Japan
15 June 1891Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Japan
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan
Diocese of Nagasaki
Archdiocese of Tōkyō
15 June 1891ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Japan Archdiocese of Tōkyō
18 February 1922Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Niigata
Archdiocese of Tōkyō
Prefecture Apostolic of Nagoya (erected)
9 November 1937Territory LostArchdiocese of Tōkyō Diocese of Yokohama (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Tōkyō
195015,2467,513,000.2%241181421076536929ap1951
197057,91214,874,107.4%673764431305201,31666ap1971
198065,56616,325,816.4%7339046314116411,69073ap1981
199082,38117,069,611.5%8141349416616441,89779ap1991
199984,43717,775,082.5%833444271975041,59479ap2000
200085,37617,880,513.5%8333742020314891,57979ap2001
200187,03817,986,093.5%7932840721314791,59678ap2002
200287,08117,999,755.5%7831038822414511,58378ap2003
200389,31018,290,876.5%7931839722414461,49477ap2004
200489,40918,408,577.5%7931139022914481,47573ap2005
201096,15719,200,258.5%8228136326413751,43175ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 27 Jul 2013