Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Pierre Rey, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tōkyō

Titular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1858BornJuliénas, France
9 Oct 187819.9ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
4 Mar 188223.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1 Jun 191253.6AppointedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
25 Jul 191253.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
6 Mar 192667.3RetiredArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
6 Mar 192667.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
25 May 193071.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tōkyō, Japan

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Rey:
Archbishop Jean-Pierre Rey M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tōkyō

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013