Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tomás Cardinal de Almeida

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1670BornLisboa
22 May 169524.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
12 Jun 169524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Dec 170636.2AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
3 Apr 170736.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
22 Jul 170938.8AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
2 Sep 171645.9SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Dec 171646.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
20 Dec 173767.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 Feb 175483.4DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Tomás de Almeida:
Tomás Cardinal de Almeida (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 7
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 234, and Page 322
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015