Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Inácio (de Santa Teresa) Torres de Souza, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1682BornPorto
14 Aug 169815.7ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
3 Feb 172138.1AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
30 Mar 172138.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
22 Feb 173956.2SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
19 Dec 174058.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
19 Nov 174158.9InstalledBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 Apr 175168.3DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Inácio (de Santa Teresa) Torres de Souza:
Archbishop Inácio (de Santa Teresa) Torres de Souza O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 11
  • ln: CB, 27 Sep 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016